Johnson v. O'Brien et al

Plaintiff: Carroll Johnson
Defendant: Pat O'Brien and Dawn Baker
Case Number: 4:2008cv04206
Filed: December 9, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Lee
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 51 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/15/10. (vjt)
December 2, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 47 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice; the Court certifies that an ifp appeal taken from this Judgment and the accompanying Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/2/10. (vjt)
October 12, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS that Plaintiff's 1 Complaint be DISMISSED with prejudice; all pending motions be rendered moot; and the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith; objections must be received no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 10/12/2010. (jas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. O'Brien et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carroll Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawn Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?