Hall v. USAble Life

Plaintiff: Gail Hall
Defendant: USAble Life
Case Number: 4:2008cv04214
Filed: December 12, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Labor: E.R.I.S.A. Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 6, 2011 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 48 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/6/11. (vjt)
March 28, 2011 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER finding that the Court lacks subject matter jurisdiction, this case is hereby remanded to Pulaski County Circuit Court. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 3/28/11. (vjt)
July 22, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion to Remand to State Court; and denying second 22 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/22/09. (bkp)
December 17, 2008 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/17/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. USAble Life
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Hall
Represented By: Leon Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAble Life
Represented By: Allan W. Horne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?