Meeker v. Burns et al

Plaintiff: Ronald Meeker
Defendant: Judy Burns, Stephen Ellis, Nathan Ellis, Charles Ellis, John Does and Doe Corporation
Case Number: 4:2008cv04219
Filed: December 17, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2010 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltfs' 88 Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/6/10. (vjt)
April 2, 2010 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the Court having been notified that a settlement has been reached in this matter, hereby dismisses the complaint and all claims in this action against defts with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/2/10. (vjt)
March 25, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING pltfs' 69 Motion for Continuance of Trial; Jury Trial will begin at 9:15 a.m. on Wednesday, April 7, 2010; Pltfs are directed to file their Pretrial Disclosure Sheet by 3/30/2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/25/10. (vjt)
March 2, 2010 66 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that pltfs' 60 Motion for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED; Nathan Ellis's 49 MOTION to Dismiss is DENIED; Pltfs must file their third amended complaint within 7 days of the entry of this Order; Pltfs' 59 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/2/10. (vjt)
September 3, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 40 Motion to Quash. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/3/09. (bkp)
August 18, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting motions to dismiss 17 26 by defts Burns and Stephen Ellis, dismissing pltfs' claims against them without prejudice; pltfs' 19 motion for additional time to serve Nathan Ellis is DENIED as moot; pltfs' 25 motion for leave to file a second amended complaint is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/18/09. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meeker v. Burns et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Meeker
Represented By: Steven Richard Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?