Combs & Company Inc v. Carpenter Sullivan LLC

Plaintiff: Combs & Company Inc
Defendant: Carpenter Sullivan LLC
Counter Claimant: Carpenter Sullivan LLC
Counter Defendant: Combs & Company Inc
Case Number: 4:2008cv04223
Filed: December 22, 2008
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2010 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice by reason of settlement. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/11/10. (bkp)
December 1, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 8 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 13 Motion for Protective Order; denying 14 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/1/09. (bkp)
November 4, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel directing them to reply by 5:00 p.m., November 11, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/4/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Combs & Company Inc v. Carpenter Sullivan LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Combs & Company Inc
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carpenter Sullivan LLC
Represented By: Jim L. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Carpenter Sullivan LLC
Represented By: Jim L. Julian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Combs & Company Inc
Represented By: Everett Clarke Tucker, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?