Big Impressions LLC v. Hewlett-Packard Company

Plaintiff: Big Impressions LLC
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Case Number: 4:2009cv00002
Filed: January 5, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion for Reconsideration of 37 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/29/10. (bkp)
April 1, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing plaintiff's claims with prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/1/10. (bkp)
March 31, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Tre Kitchens, Caroline Lewis, Lyn Pruitt, Carrie Bumgardner and Jeff Spillyards to bring certain electronic equipment into the Courthouse between Monday, April 5, 2010, and Friday, April 9, 2010. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/31/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Big Impressions LLC v. Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Big Impressions LLC
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?