Chambless v. Saline County Detention Facility

Plaintiff: Randy Chambless
Defendant: Saline County Detention Facility
Case Number: 4:2009cv00027
Filed: January 15, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prison Condition: Civil Rights Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 25, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 80 Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, defts' 67 Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED, and pltf's complaint against defts is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/25/10. (vjt)
February 10, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending defts' motion for summary judgment be granted and pltf's complaint against defts be dismissed with prejudice 67 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 2/10/10. (tjj)
December 7, 2009 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons for the deft Dru Reed and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the summons, original and amended complaints on deft at 296 Grant 82, Sheridan, AR 72150, without prepayment of fees therefor; and denying 48 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 12/7/09. (bkp)
November 4, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel and directing defts to provide to the Court the last-known address of deft Reed within ten days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/4/09. (bkp)
March 31, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve summons, complaint and amended complaints upon defts Reed, Westbrook, Lobbs, Bruce Pennington and Files without prepayment of costs therefor, and denying plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 3/31/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambless v. Saline County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Chambless
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saline County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?