USA v. Arkansas, State of et al

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: Arkansas, State of, Mike Beebe, John M Selig, James C Green and Calvin Price
Case Number: 4:2009cv00033
Filed: January 16, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 42:12101 American Disability Act for Handicapped

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2012 254 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to the Opinion and Order 252 , and the Amended Declaration 253 , judgment is hereby entered in favor of defts and against the pltf in the amount of $150,580.00 as costs of the action. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/13/12. (vjt)
February 6, 2012 252 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that defts' motion for award of attorneys' fees and costs 232 238 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; the motion for an award of attorneys' fees and litigation expenses is denied; defts are given leave to amend their motion for an award of costs by submitting an affidavit as directed within seven days from the entry of this Opinion and Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/6/12. (vjt)
June 8, 2011 229 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 228 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/8/11. (vjt)
February 28, 2011 223 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 222 ORDER granting 220 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply; the parties have until 3/17/11 to file a reply to the post-trial briefs. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/28/11. (vjt)
August 26, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 145 Motion in Limine to exclude legal opinions by defts' experts. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/26/10. (vjt)
August 23, 2010 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defts' 129 Motion to Quash the Subpoenas of Marcia Harding and Janet Estes; Janet Estes and Marcia Harding are directed to provide the documents requested in those subpoenas by 5:00 p.m. CDT on August 26, 2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/23/10. (vjt)
July 30, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 74 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 77 Motion to Compel; denying 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 87 Motion in Limine; denying 90 Motion for Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/30/10. (bkp)
May 27, 2010 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign Case No. 4:10cv00327 to this Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/27/10. (bkp)
April 7, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that USA's 42 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED; Defts' 49 Motion to Strike is DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/7/10. (vjt)
November 30, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file no later than December 2, 2009, responses to 29 First MOTION to Compel Production of Documents and 27 First MOTION to Compel Entry Upon Land. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/30/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Arkansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Benjamin O. Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Beebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John M Selig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James C Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calvin Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?