Calaway v. Practice Management Services Inc et al

Plaintiff: Rhonda Calaway
Defendant: Practice Management Services Inc and Richard Johns
Case Number: 4:2009cv00061
Filed: January 27, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Jobs Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2011 92 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 91 Order dismissing complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/3/11. (kpr)
December 1, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION FROM ARKANSAS SUPREME COURT re 28 Certification Order, re 30 Per Curiam Order; Certified Question Answered. Signed by Jim Hannah, Chief Justice on 11/11/10. (vjt)
October 27, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER contiuing the jury trial to the week of August 1, 2011 and denying as moot 36 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Rhonda Calaway. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/27/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calaway v. Practice Management Services Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Calaway
Represented By: Nicholas Lincoln Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Practice Management Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Johns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?