Lube v. Travelers Indemnity Company

Plaintiff: Christopher Lube
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Counter Claimant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Counter Defendant: Christopher Lube
Case Number: 4:2009cv00063
Filed: January 29, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Insurance Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/28/09. (bkp)
December 9, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Protective Order; denying 19 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/9/09. (bkp)
October 14, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Compel and directing plaintiff to answer deft's Interrogatories and Requests for Production within 20 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/14/09. (bkp)
October 5, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing attorney for plaintiff to respond to deft's 11 MOTION to Compel by 5:00 p.m. on Thursday, October 8, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/5/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lube v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Lube
Represented By: John B. Thurman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: James W. Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: James W. Tilley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Christopher Lube
Represented By: John B. Thurman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?