Lexicon Inc v. Ace American Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Lexicon Inc
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company and National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Case Number: 4:2009cv00067
Filed: February 2, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2011 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL pursuant to the 136 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by the parties, the complaint, counterclaim, and all other claims in this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/27/11. (vjt)
January 7, 2010 113 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Ace's motion for summary judgment 75 and National Union's 39 motion for summary judgment are GRANTED; Lexicon's motions for summary judgment 86 102 are both DENIED; Lexicon's claims against Ace and National Union are dismissed with prejudice; judgment will be entered accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/7/10. (vjt)
December 31, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying 69 Regions's Motion to Intervene; granting 81 Lexicon's Motion for leave to file a first amended complaint; Lexicon must file its amended complaint within 5 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/31/2009.(thd)
March 11, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice for Charles J. Jesuit, Jr. to appear for Ace American Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/11/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lexicon Inc v. Ace American Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lexicon Inc
Represented By: John C. Calhoun, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?