Dunham v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

Plaintiff: James Dunham
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Case Number: 4:2009cv00086
Filed: February 4, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Pope
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 24, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot pltf's 58 Motion to Compel Discovery and for an Award of Sanctions. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/24/10. (vjt)
April 9, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's 50 Motion to Compel and for Sanctions is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; pltf's 52 Motion for Hearing has been granted. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/9/10. (vjt)
December 18, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Compel; Deft must provide full responses by January 1, 2010; granting 42 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order; the trial scheduled for January 25, 2010, will be continued; a new scheduling order will be entered separately. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/18/09. (mkf)
November 10, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that 23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/10/09. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunham v. Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dunham
Represented By: James A. Streett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?