Westphal v. Lase Med Inc et al

Plaintiff: Therese Westphal
Defendant: Lase Med Inc, Antonella Carpenter and Joseph P Ward
Case Number: 4:2009cv00099
Filed: February 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 16, 2011 161 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 155 156 jury verdicts in favor of Therese Westphal against Antonella Carpenter and Lase Med Inc. Therese Westphal is awarded $500,000 in compensatory damages and $1,000,000.00 in punitive damages against these defendants, individually. Plaintiff's claims against Defts Lase Med of Arkansas, Joseph P. Ward, M.D., Individually, and Joseph P. Ward, M.D., P.A. were dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/16/11. (kpr)
June 6, 2011 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re jury trial scheduled for June 13, 2011 at 9:15 a.m. The Clerk is requested to provide a copy of this order to defts Antonella Carpenter and Joseph P. Ward by certified mail. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/6/11. (kpr)
April 12, 2011 133 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to list deft Antonella Carpenter as proceeding pro se and to send copies of the Court's Orders datetd April 7, 2011 and April 11, 2011, to deft Carpenter by certified mail, at the address set forth in this Order.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/12/11. (kpr)
April 11, 2011 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/11/11. (kpr)
February 24, 2011 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER withdrawing 97 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/24/11. (kpr)
February 22, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 89 Motions to Compel. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/22/11. (bkp)
December 9, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Compel and directing defts to provide plaintiff with the requested discovery by 5:00 p.m., Monday, December 21, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/9/09. (bkp)
December 1, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing defts to respond by 12:00 noon on Tuesday, December 8, 2009 to the 35 MOTION to Compel filed by Therese Westphal. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/1/09. (bkp)
April 14, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to counsel re representation. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/14/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westphal v. Lase Med Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Therese Westphal
Represented By: Will Bond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lase Med Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonella Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?