Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc v. Bank of England

Plaintiff: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc
Defendant: Bank of England
Case Number: 4:2009cv00198
Filed: March 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 24, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER LIFTING STAY. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/24/10. (bkp)
March 22, 2010 41 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED ORDER for an extension of time for deft to file under seal a reply to plaintiff's memorandum of law in opposition to deft's motion t o dismiss the amended complaint up to and including March 22, 2010. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/22/10. (bkp)
August 19, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/19/09. (bkp)
June 26, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/26/09. (mkf)
April 13, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/13/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc v. Bank of England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lehman Brothers Holdings Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of England
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?