Morane v. BMW of North America LLC

Plaintiff: Jay Alan Morane
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Case Number: 4:2009cv00277
Filed: April 10, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/10/2010. (jct)
April 28, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file, on or before 5/14/10, a supplemental brief on the issue of subject matter jurisdiction; deft's response due on or before 5/28/10. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/28/10. (vjt)
January 27, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Motion to Lift Stay; finding as moot 35 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 44 Motion for Notice of Related Case; granting 45 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/27/10. (bkp)
September 29, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Pleading; granting 23 24 Motions for Leave to Appear pursuant to Local Rule 83.5(d); and granting 25 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/29/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morane v. BMW of North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Alan Morane
Represented By: Todd Martin Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BMW of North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?