Kelley v. Regis Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Carol P Kelley
Defendant: Regis Corporation, Mary Senkbeil, Cara Conner and Amy Saddlefield
Case Number: 4:2009cv00299
Filed: April 22, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to a settlement by the parties. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/22/10. (bkp)
October 1, 2009 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 43 Motion to Dismiss Party; finding as moot 18 Motion to Dismiss Party; finding as moot 20 Motion to Dismiss Party. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/1/09. (bkp)
September 2, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk's Office to correct deft's name from Cara Conner to Cara Comer. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/2/09. (bkp)
August 11, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER extending ddls to respond to motions to dismiss for 45 days from the date an attorney, who remains counsel for plaintiff during such time, is appointed. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/11/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kelley v. Regis Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol P Kelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regis Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Senkbeil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara Conner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Saddlefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?