Hardeman v. USA et al

Plaintiff: Kimball Hardeman
Defendant: USA, Department of Justice and Drug Enforcement Agency
Case Number: 4:2009cv00312
Filed: April 29, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to the 36 Order filed on May 18, 2010, and the 39 Order filed on May 27, 2010, dismissing plaintiff's claim of hostile work environment without prejudice; and dismissing the claims dismissed by the Court's January 11, 2010 Order with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 6/4/10. (bkp)
May 27, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/27/10. (bkp)
January 11, 2010 26 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that Defts' 11 MOTION to Dismiss is hereby granted as to all claims except the hostile environment claim. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/11/10. (vjt)
August 28, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Stay deadlines set forth in the Initial Scheudling Order; the Court will issue a new Initital Scheduling Order after a ruling is made on the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/28/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hardeman v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimball Hardeman
Represented By: A. Douglas Chavis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?