Bonds v. Keith

Petitioner: Steven E Bonds
Respondent: Roy Keith
Case Number: 4:2009cv00342
Filed: May 12, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of G David Guntharp against Steven E Bonds re 45 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations dismissing plaintiff's complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/24/09. (bkp)
September 16, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending this case be dismissed without prejudice due to non-exhaustion; further recommending petitioner's motion for a hearing be denied 1 4 38 ; Objections to R&R due by 9/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 9/16/09. (tjj)
May 26, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to serve a copy of the petition and this Order on the respondent and the U.S. Attorney by regular mail and directing the respondent to file an answer within 20 days after service of this petition, exclusive of the day of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 5/26/09. (bkp)
April 30, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND OPINION regarding venue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Earl S. Hines on April 30, 2009. (rml, ) [Transferred from txed on 5/12/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonds v. Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven E Bonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Roy Keith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?