Arkansas, State of v. Automotive Warranty Solutions LLC

Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Defendant: Automotive Warranty Solutions LLC
Case Number: 4:2009cv00355
Filed: May 12, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 47:521 Communications Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2010 84 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to 83 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of State of Arkansas against Ralph Mancuso in the amount of $33,500.00; Mancuso is hereby permanently enjoined from further violations listed herein. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/5/10. (vjt)
July 9, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 72 Settlement reached between the plaintiff and deft Automotive Warranty Solutions LLC and dismissing all claims with prejudice and denying all pending motions as moot. This order does not apply to the claims of the plaintiff against deft Ralph Mancuso. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/9/10. (bkp)
April 20, 2010 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 42 Motion for Clarification and for a Telephone Conference is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; the motion for telephone conference was granted, and was held on 4/19/10; the motion for clarification is denied as moot; Automotive Warranty's oral motion for a stay of discovery is granted; discovery will be stayed until the Court rules on the pending 49 Motion to Dismiss or for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/20/10. (vjt)
April 19, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 51 Unopposed MOTION for Continuance of Jury Trial scheduled for 6/1/10; a new trial date and scheduling deadlines will be set by separate Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/19/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkansas, State of v. Automotive Warranty Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas, State of
Represented By: Kevin Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automotive Warranty Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?