Doolittle v. Pichouski et al

Plaintiff: Arthur L Doolittle
Defendant: Pichouski, Rick, Hoskins and Andrews
Case Number: 4:2009cv00376
Filed: May 19, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2011 124 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Defendant, Bettis against Plaintiff,Arthur L Doolittle. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 05/11/2011. (ksm)
January 4, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file an Amended Application to Proceed In forma Pauperis (enclosed) within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/4/11. (vjt)
July 20, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 15 Partial Report and Recommendations and directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for defts Stewart, Lumpkins, Andrews, Bettis, Pichouski and Hoskins and the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, complaint, amended complaint, the second amended complaint and this order on those defts without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 7/20/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doolittle v. Pichouski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur L Doolittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pichouski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hoskins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?