Maize v. Hawker Beechcraft Corporation

Plaintiff: Martin O Maize, Sr
Defendant: Hawker Beechcraft Corporation
Case Number: 4:2009cv00399
Filed: May 28, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2012 145 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Hawker Beechcraft Corporation against Martin O Maize, Sr re 141 Jury Verdict and denying Hawker Beechcraft's renewed motion for judgment as moot. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/27/12. (kpr)
December 28, 2011 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 119 Motion in Limine; further amending the Amended Final Scheduling Order; directing the parties to exchange final exhibits, exhibit lists and witness lists by January 13, 2012, and to deliver a copy of these materials to chambers by the same date;. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/28/11. (kpr)
December 27, 2011 127 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER 126 . Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/27/11. (kpr)
January 19, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 81 Motion for Approval of Disbursement of Funds; pltf's counsel will seek reimbursement for out-of-pocket expenses from this Court after such expenses are incurred. Signed by Judge G. Thomas Eisele on 1/19/11. (vjt)
July 30, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to proceed pro hac vice by attorney Megan S. Monsour on behalf of the defendant. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/30/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maize v. Hawker Beechcraft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin O Maize, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawker Beechcraft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?