Old Republic National Title Insurance Company v. Landmark Closing Company et al

Plaintiff: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Defendant: Landmark Closing Company and Marci Ingram
Case Number: 4:2009cv00422
Filed: June 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 3, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL, the Court having been notified that a settlement has been reached in this matter, hereby dismisses the complaint and all claims in this action against deft with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/3/11. (vjt)
June 1, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that First Community Bank's 62 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART; the motion is granted as to Old Republic's negligence claim but denied as to its conversion claim. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/1/10. (vjt)
May 26, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT, pltf is hereby awarded judgment, jointly and severally, against defts Landmark Closing Company and Marci A. Ingram, in the amount of the sum of $460,000.00 plus costs in the amount of $542.00, plus interest at the rate of 5% per annum from the date of entry until paid. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/26/10. (vjt)
June 19, 2009 14 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION enjoining defendants as set forth herein. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/19/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company v. Landmark Closing Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Old Republic National Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Monte Darrel Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landmark Closing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marci Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?