Williams v. MD Cowan Inc et al

Plaintiff: Joshua Alan Williams
Defendant: MD Cowan Inc, Tesco Corporation, Jeffrey Anderson, Rig Technology Ltd, Venturetech Corporation International and Suntrust Leasing Corporation
Case Number: 4:2009cv00459
Filed: June 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 27, 2012 185 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT 184 Order granting Motion to Dismiss and dismissing all plaintiff's claims against MD Cowan, TESCO, Anderson and R ig Tech with prejudice. All defts' cross-claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/12. (kpr)
April 16, 2012 180 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 156 Motion to Strike ; denying 163 Motion to Amend/Correct; finding as moot 164 Motion to Exclude; finding as moot 166 Motion in Limine. The Court requests a joint status report from the defts by April 20, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/16/12. (kpr)
November 8, 2011 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 152 joint Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's complaint against defendants MD Cowan, Inc., and Rig Technology, Ltd. is dismissed with prejudice. The Intervenors' complaint against MD Cowan and Rig Tech is also dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/7/11. (kpr)
September 29, 2011 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 81 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 85 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 96 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 99 Motion in Limine; denying 101 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 105 Motion in Limine; denying 106 , but, as to common-law duty, the denial is without prejudice, the Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 109 Motion in Limine; denying 110 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/11. (kpr)
July 10, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 4 Motions for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Patrick E. Carr and Guy A. Thiesssen. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/10/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. MD Cowan Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Alan Williams
Represented By: Phillip Lee Votaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MD Cowan Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tesco Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rig Technology Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Venturetech Corporation International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suntrust Leasing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?