Knowlton et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc

Plaintiff: James R Knowlton and Katherine D Knowlton
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00461
Filed: June 24, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the Knowltons' Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 54 . Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/7/11. (vjt)
August 9, 2010 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Knowltons' Motions for Partial Summary Judgment 11 36 and Arrington's 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/9/10. (vjt)
July 16, 2010 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Compel and directing the Knowltons to identify all of these documents by August 2, 2010; denying Arrington's request to extend the discovery ddl for 30 days; however, extending the discovery ddl to August 16, 2010; dispositive motions due by August 23, 2010, pretrial disclosure sheets due by August 27, 2010, and objections to pretrial disclosure sheets due by September 7, 2010. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/16/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knowlton et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James R Knowlton
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine D Knowlton
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?