Swaffar et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc

Plaintiff: Elmer Joe Swaffar and Todd Swaffar
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00462
Filed: June 24, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 13, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 40 Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing plaintiff's claims with prejudice; finding as moot 46 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/13/10. (bkp)
August 6, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 27 Arrington's Motion for Summary Judgment. Swaffar's claims for unjust enrichment and promissory estoppel are dismissed. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/6/2010. (thd)
July 23, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 3 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 5 voluntary Motion to Dismiss plaintiff Todd Swaffer; finding as moot 6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 8 Motion to Amend/Correct and directing plaintiff to file the Amended Complaint by 5 p.m., Thursday, July 30, 2009 (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swaffar et al v. David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elmer Joe Swaffar
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Swaffar
Represented By: John T. Holleman, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David H Arrington Oil & Gas Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?