Evans v. Stryker Corporation et al

Plaintiff: James Evans
Defendant: Stryker Corporation and Stryker Sales Corporation
Case Number: 4:2009cv00486
Filed: July 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding 86 Order directing counsel to meet the requirements to participate or enroll to practice in the Eastern Distsrict of Arkansas by September 30, 2009; and terminating attorneys Charles H. Thronson, James T. Blanch, Jeffrey B. Wihtol, John P. Ball, Richard E. Mrazik and Mario Horwitz for non-compliance of the Court's Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/1/09. (bkp)
September 16, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel to comply with Local Rule 83.5 no later than September 30, 2009. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/16/09. (bkp)
June 22, 2009 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Stryker defendants' Motion to Sever and Transfer 35 is Granted. Withing fourteen(14)days from the date of this order, plaintiff Cantrell, plaintiff Evans, plaintiffs Tranoses, and plaintiff Limantzakis shall indicate the dis tricts to which they wish their cases to be transferred. Further, the Stryker defendants' Motion to Dismiss 66 is DENIED. Counsel shall confer in person or by telephone regarding discovery protocol, including the production of plaintiffs' fact sheets, and submit a proposed discovery schedule on or before July 10, 2009. The parties are encouraged to follow the guidelines agreed to by the parties in other District of Oregon pain pump cases. If the parties cannot reach agreement, they may request a telephone status conference by submitting a letter describing in detail the substance of the discussions and why the parties could not reach agreement. Signed on June 19, 2009 by Chief Judge Ann L. Aiken. (cp)[Transferred from ord on 7/9/2009.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Stryker Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey B Wihtol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin N. Souede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stryker Sales Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin N. Souede
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?