Church Mutual Insurance Company v. Copenhaver et al

Plaintiff: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Harold R Copenhaver, Jeff W O'Donnell and United Insurance Agency Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00487
Filed: July 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 22, 2011 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 91 94 Motions to Vacate Settlement Agreement.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/22/11. (bkp)
October 13, 2010 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice pursuant to settlement by the parties. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/13/10. (bkp)
May 24, 2010 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/24/10. (bkp)
April 20, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 61 Motions for Reconsideration re 57 Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/20/10. (bkp)
March 29, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 50 Motion to Compel; granting 55 Motion to Quash and finding the motion for protective order moot. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/29/10. (bkp)
January 11, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 1/11/10. (bkp)
September 29, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/29/09. (bkp)
September 2, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to submit a witness and exhibit list by e-mail no later than 9/24/09 and to bring a bound copy of the exhibits to the hearing; and authorizing Jack Cherry, Mary O'Brien, Paul Waddell and Matthew Jackson to bring electronic devices to the courthouse for the proceeding scheduled for 9/28/09 at 9:15 a.m.. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/2/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Church Mutual Insurance Company v. Copenhaver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Church Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold R Copenhaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff W O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Insurance Agency Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?