One Bank & Trust N A v. Larry McNeill Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust et al

Plaintiff: One Bank & Trust N A
Defendant: Larry McNeill Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust and Larry R McNeill
Case Number: 4:2009cv00525
Filed: July 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 27, 2012 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 79 Motion to Set Aside Judgment; denying 80 Motion to Set Aside Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/27/12. (kpr)
October 18, 2011 78 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT against The Larry McNeill Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust, and Larry R. McNeill, jointly and severally in favor of One Banc in the amount of $110,000.00, which shall bear interest at 5.75% per annum. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/18/11. (kpr)
May 28, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 43 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/28/10. (bkp)
February 1, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/1/10. (mkf)
December 15, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 7 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/15/09. (bkp)
December 7, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re 15 Answer to Complaint filed by Larry McNeill Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/ 7/09. (bkp)
October 29, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking 12 Answer to Complaint filed by Larry R McNeill and directing the Trust to retain counsel, have counsel enter an appearance, file an answer to plaintiff's complaint and file a response to plaintiff's motion for default judgment by 5:00 p.m., Wednesday, November 18, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/29/09. (bkp)
October 23, 2009 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with respect to the Trust and granting the motion with respect to Mr. Larry McNeill. Mr. McNeill is given an additional 30 days from the date of this Order to file any desired answer to 1 Complaint. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/23/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: One Bank & Trust N A v. Larry McNeill Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: One Bank & Trust N A
Represented By: Alex T. Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry McNeill Irrevocable Life Insurance Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry R McNeill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?