J & J Sports Productions Inc v. Whitmore et al

Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Inc
Defendant: Frank Whitmore, Patrick Whitmore, Petrice Whitmore, Patti Whitmore and Jazzi's LLC
Case Number: 4:2009cv00553
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 47:521 Communications Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 8, 2012 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL pursuant to 44 Notice of Settlement, these actions are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/8/12. (vjt)
February 24, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES 4:09CV00553, 4:09CV00904, and 4:10CV01987; all future pleadings are to be filed in the LEAD CASE 4:09CV00553; defts' 29 MOTION for Extension of Time, up to and including 3/14/11, in which to respond to discovery is GRANTED; a single scheduling order will be entered in the consolidated cases, which will include new deadlines for discovery and dispositive motions, and a new trial date. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/24/11. (vjt)
February 3, 2011 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER giving parties up to and including 10 days from the entry date of this Order to file any objections to consolidating this case with related cases 4:09CV00904 and 4:10CV01987. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/3/11. (vjt)
August 14, 2009 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Limited Admission. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/14/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J & J Sports Productions Inc v. Whitmore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J & J Sports Productions Inc
Represented By: Thomas P. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petrice Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Whitmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jazzi's LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?