Douglas et al v. First Student Inc

Plaintiff: Nate Douglas, Thomas Derico, Lisa Smith and Leroy Robinson
Defendant: First Student Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00652
Filed: July 31, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 15, 2014 288 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT: First Student is ordered to pay plaintiffs' attorneys' fees in the amount of $1,512,771.90 and costs in the amount of $389,453.88. Judgment is accordingly entered in favor of plaintiffs and against defendant First Student. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/15/2014. (ks)
January 26, 2012 152 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 151 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines; Motions due 3/1/12. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/26/12. (vjt)
December 2, 2011 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 146 Joint MOTION for Order Establishing Discovery and Motion Deadlines. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/2/11. (vjt)
November 23, 2011 147 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION ARKANSAS SUPREME COURT re 141 Certification of Issue to State Court, 143 Per Curiam Order. Signed by Jim Gunter, Associate Justice on 11/3/11. (vjt)
April 22, 2011 143 Opinion or Order of the Court PER CURIAM ORDER re: notice of acceptance of certification from Supreme Court of Arkansas re 141 Certification of Issue to State Court. Opinion Delivered April 21, 2011. (vjt)
April 4, 2011 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE until the Supreme Court of Arkansas either declines to answer or answers the question certified by Order of this Court. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/4/11. (vjt)
February 7, 2011 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER suggesting the parties allow Dwayne Holmes, an unrepresented witness, until 2/14/11, to obtain counsel to represent him in a related matter. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/7/11. (vjt)
October 7, 2010 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying deft's 98 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting pltfs' 103 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; pltfs are directed to file their amended complaint within 7 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/7/10. (vjt)
October 6, 2010 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 112 Joint Motion to Extend Remaining Deadlines in Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 11/25/2010; Motions due by 1/4/2011. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/6/10. (vjt)
September 3, 2010 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 109 Motion for Leave to File a sur-reply to the 108 Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/3/10. (bkp)
January 11, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting Pltfs' 40 MOTION for Conditional Collective Action Certification; the parties are directed to submit for the Court's consideration an agreed collective action notice within 14 days from the entry of this Order; if parties are unable to agree, pltfs should submit a draft notice within 14 days, and deft will have 7 days to respond. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 1/11/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Douglas et al v. First Student Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nate Douglas
Represented By: John L. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Derico
Represented By: John L. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Smith
Represented By: John L. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Robinson
Represented By: John L. Burnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Student Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?