Key v. Finks et al

Plaintiff: Greg Key
Defendant: Hayward Finks, Willie Davis and Little Rock, City of
Case Number: 4:2009cv00658
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 10, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 37 JUDGMENT pursuant to 36 Opinion and Order entered on 9/1/10, and the 44 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of the defts on the claims of Greg Key, dismissing pltf's complaint with prejudice; pltf's state law claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/10/10. (vjt)
September 1, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 36 Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of City of Little Rock, Hayward Finks, and Willie Davis dismissing the complaint of Greg Key with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/1/10. (vjt)
July 14, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING pltf's 20 Motion to Extend Motion Cut-Off Date; Motions due by 7/27/2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/14/10. (vjt)
April 7, 2010 15 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that defts' 8 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/7/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Key v. Finks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Key
Represented By: Edward G. Adcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hayward Finks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?