Ashley v. Obama et al

Plaintiff: Ricky Ashley
Defendant: Barack Obama, Murry, Bruce Pennington and Walton
Case Number: 4:2009cv00659
Filed: August 4, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 23, 2009 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion to Reopen Case; adopting 30 Report and Recommendations in their entirety. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/23/09. (mkf)
November 4, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS denying 27 MOTION to Reopen Case filed by Ricky Ashley. Objections to R&R due no later than eleven (11) days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 11/4/09. (bkp)
October 7, 2009 21 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 20 Memorandum and Order dismissing case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/7/09. (bkp)
September 17, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the style of the case to indicate the correct name of deft Murry as Michael Murray and deft Walton as Michael Walton. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/17/09. (bkp)
September 2, 2009 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing plaintiff to notify the Court of his current address and intent to continue prosecution of this action within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 9/2/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ashley v. Obama et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Ashley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barack Obama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?