Green Party of Arkansas et al v. Daniels

Plaintiff: Green Party of Arkansas, Mark Swaney and Rebekah Kennedy
Defendant: Charlie Daniels
Case Number: 4:2009cv00695
Filed: August 27, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER grantin 37 Secretary Daniels's motion for summary judgment; denying as moot 58 Motion for summary judgment; denying as moot 60 Motion in Limine; and denying as moot 77 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/29/10. (hph)
May 10, 2010 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing deft to respond to 34 Pltfs' MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on or before 5/18/10; pltf's reply due 5/25/10; pltfs are directed to respond to 37 Deft's MOTION for Summary Judgment on or before 5/21/10; deft's reply due 5/28/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/10/10. (vjt)
April 29, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 29 Motion to Extend the Dispositive Motions Deadline; Dispositive motions due by 5/7/2010. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/29/10. (vjt)
November 16, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Charlie Daniels is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/16/09. (vjt)
August 28, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Appear as counsel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/28/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Party of Arkansas et al v. Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Party of Arkansas
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Swaney
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebekah Kennedy
Represented By: Holly Elizabeth Dickson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlie Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?