Doctor's Testing Center LLC II et al v. USA et al

Plaintiff: Doctor's Testing Center LLC II and Ron Davis
Defendant: USA, Department of Health and Human Services, Centers for Medicare Medicade Services, Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield, CMS Pinnacle Business Solutions, AdvancedMed of Maryland and Q2 Administrators LLC of South Carolina
Case Number: 4:2009cv00707
Filed: August 31, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1395 HHS: Adverse Reimbursement Review
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 19, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion for Reconsideration re 55 Judgment, 54 Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/19/10. (bkp)
January 25, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 50 Joint of Separate Defendants' Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield and Pinnacle Business Solutions, Inc. Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/25/10. (bkp)
January 12, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion to Strike ; denying 38 Motion to Dismiss; denying 40 Motion to Strike ; denying 40 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/12/10. (bkp)
September 16, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to change the name of separate deft from CMS Pinnacle Business Solutions to Pinnacle Business Solutions, Inc. Signed DOC by Mary A. Johnson on 9/16/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doctor's Testing Center LLC II et al v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doctor's Testing Center LLC II
Represented By: Max M. Horner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare Medicade Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Pinnacle Business Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AdvancedMed of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Q2 Administrators LLC of South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?