Taylor v. Selig et al

Plaintiff: Felix D Taylor
Defendant: John Selig, Krista Hughes, Sara Freeman, Shonta Ellison, Superior Senior Care Inc, Joseph Pascual, Rita Hurst, Donna Kelso and Doe
Case Number: 4:2009cv00751
Filed: September 18, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2345 Medicare Recovery
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2010 57 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 56 Order dismissing plaintiff's federal claims with prejudice and dismissing plaintiff's state claims without prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/20/10. (bkp)
February 11, 2010 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing the telephone conference set for February 17, 2010, at 10:00 a.m. until February 26, 2010, at 9:15 a.m.; and directing defts to file a response to the pending motion no later than February 15, 2010, with plaintiff's reply, if any, due no later than February 24, 2010. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/11/10. (bkp)
February 8, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re 31 MOTION for Order filed by Felix D Taylor, which the Court will construe as a motion being filed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(a) requesting a preliminary injunction to reinstate his caregiver service. Defendants are t o file a response on or before 2/12/10 to the motion. The parties are given notice that a telephone conference is scheduled for 2/17/10, at 10:00 a.m., & are directed to call 1-501-604-5150 & inform the Court of their telephone numbers where they can be reached for the telephone conference by noon on 2/16/10. ( In Chambers Telephone Conference set for 2/17/10 at 10:00 AM before Judge James M. Moody) Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/8/2010. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Selig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felix D Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Selig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krista Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shonta Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superior Senior Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Pascual
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Hurst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donna Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?