Martin v. Beard-Breeding Painting Company Inc

Plaintiff: Thomas A Martin
Defendant: Beard-Breeding Painting Company Inc
Case Number: 4:2009cv00765
Filed: September 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 15, 2012 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing with prejudice all claims against defendant Beard-Breeding Painting Company, Inc. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/15/12. (hph)
June 1, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing attorney David L. Jones to represent plaintiff in all further proceedings in this case. The Clerk of Court is requested to send Mr. Jones a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/1/11. (kpr)
May 16, 2011 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Everett O. Martindale, 902 West Second Street, Little Rock, AR 72201, to represent pltf Thomas A. Martin in all further proceedings in this case and directing the Clerk to send Mr. Martindale a copy of this order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/16/11. (kpr)
May 4, 2011 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER appointing Paul E. Herrod, Herrod Law Firm, 1405 Pike Avenue, North Little Rock, AR 72114, to represent pltf in all further proceedings and directing the Clerk of the Court to send Mr. Herrod a copy of this Order and Local Rule 83.7. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/4/11. (kpr)
April 12, 2011 18 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to Andrea Davis directing that she file the affidavit requested by an e-mail from the Court on February 25, 2011 within 14 days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/12/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Beard-Breeding Painting Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beard-Breeding Painting Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?