Storay v. Little Rock Police Department

Plaintiff: Robert J Storay
Defendant: Little Rock Police Department
Case Number: 4:2009cv00788
Filed: October 5, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2010 69 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 68 Order granting Motion for Summary Judgment and dismissing the case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/22/10. (bkp)
September 14, 2010 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 59 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Little Rock Arkansas, City of, directing the plaintiff to respond by 5:00 p.m., Tuesday, September 21, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 9/14/10. (bkp)
April 8, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Dismiss Officer Chad O'Kelley, Officer Spencer Smith and Sergeant Ashley Helton. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/8/10. (bkp)
March 2, 2010 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 40 MOTION to Dismiss filed by defendants directing plaintiff to respond to the motion by 5:00 p.m., Tuesday, March 9, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/2/10. (bkp)
January 13, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 34 Motion for More Definite Statement and directing plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 5 p.m., Wednesday, January 27, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/13/10. (bkp)
December 16, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to plaintiff extending ddl to file amended complaint until 5 p.m., Wednesday, December 30, 2009 23 . Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/16/09. (bkp)
December 4, 2009 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot 21 Motion to Continue. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/4/09. Amended complaint must be filed by 5 p.m., Wednesday, December 23, 2009.(bkp) (Text modified on 12/4/2009 (bkp).
October 6, 2009 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Robert J Storay. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/6/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Storay v. Little Rock Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J Storay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?