Peace v. Bank of America NA et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly Peace
Defendant: Bank of America NA, Dyke Henry Goldsholl & Winzerling PLC and Mary A Winzerling
Case Number: 4:2009cv00849
Filed: November 9, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 16, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Based on the 37 Order entered this date, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/16/10. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 2/17/2010 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
February 2, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing plaintiff's complaint against Defendant Bank of America NA without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/2/10. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 2/3/2010 to correct the description of the document filed.)(thd)
December 9, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss; denying 12 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 13 Motion to Dismiss; granting 16 Motion for Discovery to be held in abeyance and staying discovery until January 10, 2 010, or, if deft refiles its motion to dismiss, discovery is stayed until that motion is decided.. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/9/09. (bkp)
December 1, 2009 8 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER directing plaintiff to respond to 6 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Bank of America NA by 12:00 noon on Friday, December 11, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/1/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peace v. Bank of America NA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Kathryn M. Irby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyke Henry Goldsholl & Winzerling PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary A Winzerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?