Wesley v. Crothall Services Group et al

Plaintiff: Joe S Wesley, Sr
Defendant: Crothall Services Group, Roy Haynes and James Jordan
Case Number: 4:2009cv00891
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 2, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 54 Motion for Reconsideration of 51 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment & 52 Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/2/2011. (jct)
December 29, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 51 Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered dismissing this action with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/29/10. (vjt)
September 14, 2010 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 25 Motion to Compel; pltf is directed to provide deft complete responses to the discovery requests within 20 days after being served; deft's request to extend deadlines is denied at this time. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/14/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wesley v. Crothall Services Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe S Wesley, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crothall Services Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?