Hurdsman et al v. Salkeld et al

Plaintiff: Rodney A Hurdsman, Willie Fleetwood, Golden Bowman, Roderick Silinzy, Antonio Kelly, Edward Jennings, Michael Hancock, Anyanso Agwu, Kyle Smith and Chris Smith
Defendant: James L Salkeld, Ronald E Baker, Ronald L Clark, Jonathan Bibb, Charles Covington, Gary Ferrel, Danny King, Dan McAlister, Harry Chaple, Kenneth Lamkin and Lee Danner
Case Number: 4:2009cv00892
Filed: November 23, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: St. Francis
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2012 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reopening the dispositive-motion period. Hurdsman and Fleetwood shall file a cross motion for summary judgment by 10/5/12. Responses are due 10/19/12. Jury Trial is reset for 12/10/2012 09:30 AM before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/25/12. (kpr)
August 1, 2012 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 106 Motion to Abstain; denying 106 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 108 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motions due by 8/20/12, responses due 8/31/12, and replies are due 9/7/12. The Court will hold a pretrial on 9/21/12. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/1/12. (kpr)
March 18, 2011 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 89 Partial Report and Recommendations except on the service issue. Defts' motions to dismiss 31 40 are granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiffs' conspiracy claims and Federal Administrative Procedures Act claims are dismissed without prejudice. Lamkin is still a deft, but only in his official capacity, and the style should be amended accordingly; the Arkansas Attorney General's motion to be relieved as counsel for Lamkin 71 is granted. Plaintiffs' motion for appt. of counsel is granted 28 ; and plaintiffs' motion for joinder 38 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/18/11. (kpr)
November 3, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 59 and 67 Magistrate Judge Volpe's recommended dispositions, with three clarifications to 67 ; denying 54 and 57 Kenneth Lamkin and Lee Danner's Motion to Dismiss and Motions for Summary Judgment; and denying as moot any other pending motions by these five Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/3/10. (hph)
April 19, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Plaintiff Hurdsman's 37 MOTION for Reconsideration: the Motion will be GRANTED and the Clerk of the Court is directed to re-instate Michael Hancock as a party Plaintiff in this case. Plaintiff's motion on behalf of Silinzy and Je nnings is DENIED. If Plaintiffs Silinzy and Jennings wish to remain in this lawsuit, they must file their own Motions for Reconsideration and must each submit an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, with the required calculation sheet signed by an authorized official of the detention center at which they are confined. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/19/2010. (jas)
April 6, 2010 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltfs 30 days from the entry of this Order to file their responses to defts' 31 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/6/10. (vjt)
March 19, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing, without prejudice, plaintiffss Bowman, Silinzy, Kelly, Jennings, Hancock, Agwu and Chris Smith for their failure to comply with the Court's earlier orders 17 8 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/19/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurdsman et al v. Salkeld et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney A Hurdsman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Fleetwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Silinzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Jennings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anyanso Agwu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L Salkeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald E Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald L Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Bibb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Ferrel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan McAlister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Chaple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Lamkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Danner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?