Scott v. Saline Memorial Hospital Auxiliary

Plaintiff: Christine Scott
Defendant: Saline Memorial Hospital Auxiliary
Case Number: 4:2009cv00893
Filed: November 24, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 26, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Saline County Medical Center re 48 Order granting Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/26/11. (kpr)
May 6, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting deft's 39 Motion to File Exhibits Under Seal; the Clerk is directed to file Exhibits B, C, D & E to Defendant's Reply 38 Under Seal. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/6/11. (vjt)
May 5, 2011 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion to Seal Exhibit R-1 through R-2 to plaintiff's 33 Brief in Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/5/11. (kpr)
April 6, 2011 27 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to Stipulation and Agreement. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/6/11. (kpr)
March 28, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 14 Motion to Compel. The parties will have until Wednesday, March 30, 2011, to submit an agreed protective order regarding the personnel files. If an agreement cannot be reached, the parties are directed to submit separate proposed orders for review by the judgment by 5:00 p.m., March 30, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/28/11. (kpr)
April 30, 2010 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/30/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Saline Memorial Hospital Auxiliary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Scott
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saline Memorial Hospital Auxiliary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?