Miller v. Pulaski County Medical Exchange

Plaintiff: Deretha O Miller
Defendant: Pulaski County Medical Exchange
Case Number: 4:2009cv00895
Filed: November 25, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2010 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss and dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/26/10. (bkp)
March 5, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 12 Motion to Dismiss and directing plaintiff to file an amended complaint that complies with the Court's January 15, 2010, Order by 5 p.m., Friday, March 12, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/5/10. (bkp)
January 15, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion to Dismiss and directing plaintiff to file an amended complaint by 5 p.m., Friday, January 29, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/15/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Pulaski County Medical Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deretha O Miller
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Medical Exchange
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?