First Arkansas Bank & Trust v. Lincoln Benefit Life Company

Plaintiff: First Arkansas Bank & Trust
Defendant: Lincoln Benefit Life Company
Case Number: 4:2009cv00949
Filed: December 22, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 16, 2011 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 78 Motion to Stay; granting 79 Motion to Stay until seven days after the Eighth Circuit issues its mandate. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/16/11. (kpr)
November 10, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The Court enters judgment for First Arkansas Bank and against Lincoln Benefit for $1,373,652.58. The Court also enters judgment for Mary Howard and against Lincoln Benefit for $1,326,086.53. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/10/2011. (dmn)
October 18, 2011 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Lincoln Benefit's 37 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting First Arkansas's and Mary Howard's 40 43 Motions for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 48 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/18/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Arkansas Bank & Trust v. Lincoln Benefit Life Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Arkansas Bank & Trust
Represented By: Kyle Ray Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Benefit Life Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?