Bonds v. Little Rock School District Board of Education et al

Plaintiff: Michelle Bonds
Defendant: Little Rock School District Board of Education and Linda Watson
Case Number: 4:2009cv00968
Filed: December 31, 2009
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 73 Memorandum Opinion and Order entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Little Rock School District Board of Education and Linda Watson dismissing the claims of Michelle Bonds, Vertina Banks, Patricia Crosslin , Angela Geans, Joyce Jacobs, Linda Jones, Clementine McDuffy, Valerie Rouse, and Rose Wilson with prejudice; the claims of Rodney Campbell are dismissed without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 7/8/11. (vjt)
May 2, 2011 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Sheila Green Hayes; Sheila Green Hayes terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/2/11. (vjt)
April 6, 2011 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Warrine Robinson; granting 44 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice filed by Jo Evelyn Elston; granting 45 MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Rhonda Banks; Warrine Robinson, Rhonda Banks and Jo Evelyn Elston terminated. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/6/11. (vjt)
October 13, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying defts' 23 Motion to Strike or in the alternative For More Definite Statement; counsel are directed to file their Rule 26(f) Report forthwith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/13/10. (vjt)
October 6, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER upon verbal motion by defts, the 29 Order of October 5,2010 is hereby VACATED, pending ruling of defts' 23 MOTION to Strike or, in the alternative, For More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/6/10. (vjt)
October 5, 2010 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing counsel to file the Rule 26(f) Report forthwith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 10/5/10. (vjt)
August 12, 2010 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defts' 7 Motion to Dismiss Class Allegations; granting pltf's 15 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/12/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonds v. Little Rock School District Board of Education et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Bonds
Represented By: John W. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock School District Board of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?