Hollamon v. Frito Lay Inc

Plaintiff: Kevin Hollamon
Defendant: Frito Lay Inc
Case Number: 4:2010cv00011
Filed: January 7, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2011 96 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 95 Order on Motion dismissing the case with prejudice and denying the relief sought. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/14/11. (kpr)
March 24, 2011 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion to Compel and for Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiff is ordered to respond to Frito Lay's pending motion for summary judgment within 15 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/24/11. (kpr)
October 1, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Bill Howard to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse on Tuesday, October 12, 2010 subject to the provisions stated herein. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/1/10. (vjt)
September 30, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Kevin Hollamon, Gregg M. Lemley, Jana M. Ferguson, Mike Mirelez, Court Reporter, and John Sims, Videographer, to bring certain electronics into the Courthouse on Tuesday, October 12, 2010, subject to the rules set forth in this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/30/10. (bkp)
September 15, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that deft's 46 Motion to Dismiss Complaint and for an Award of Expenses and Attorneys' Fees re a recent deposition not attended by pltf is DENIED; pro se pltf is directed to be familiar and comply with all FRCP and Local Rules of this Court; directing parties to contact Betty Tyree and arrange times to use one of the courthouse's witness rooms to conduct all depositions. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/15/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollamon v. Frito Lay Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Hollamon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frito Lay Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?