Harding University Inc v. ARMS Building & Maintenance Inc et al

Plaintiff: Harding University Inc
Defendant: ARMS Building & Maintenance Inc, Shannon Clark, Sports Engineering Technologies Inc, Challenger Industries Inc and John Does
Case Number: 4:2010cv00065
Filed: February 1, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2011 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing Harding's case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/12/2011. (dmn)
February 16, 2011 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 45 Motion to Compel and directing deft Shannon Clark to submit his responses to Harding on or before March 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 2/16/11. (bkp)
October 25, 2010 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 40 Motion to Compel and directing deft Clark to provide responses to the second set of interrogatories and requests for production to plaintiff on or before November 4, 2010. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/25/10. (bkp)
July 27, 2010 39 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Harding University Inc against ARMS Building & Maintenance Inc as to the issue of liability. The issue of damages will be determined at a later date. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/27/10. (bkp)
July 23, 2010 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 31 Motion to Strike and extending the time for service upon defts ARMS and Clark for 120 days. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/23/10. (bkp)
May 6, 2010 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 11 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 5/6/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harding University Inc v. ARMS Building & Maintenance Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harding University Inc
Represented By: Brett David Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARMS Building & Maintenance Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sports Engineering Technologies Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Challenger Industries Inc
Represented By: Charles L. Schlumberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?