Cortez v. Hosto Buchan Prater & Lawrence PLLC

Plaintiff: Blanca R Cortez
Defendant: Hosto Buchan Prater & Lawrence PLLC
Case Number: 4:2010cv00076
Filed: February 4, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2011 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment without prejudice to renew; finding as moot 80 Motion to Strike ; denying 83 Motion to Exclude; granting 87 Motion to Compel; granting 89 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 91 Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice to renew; denying 98 Motion to Exclude; granting 100 Motion to Compel; finding as moot 120 Motion to Strike. The Court's Order of September 23, 2011 is set aside, excluding Plaintiff's lay witnesses. The Court will issue a new Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/26/11. (kpr)
October 4, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The jury trial set for the week of October 24, 2011, is bumped, and the remaining pretrial ddls are suspended. The parties are directed to file responses to all pending motions on or before October 14, 2011. Any replies shall be filed on or before October 24, 2011. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 10/4/11. (kpr)
June 24, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion to Amend/Correct and directing plaintiff to file her amended complaint within five days of the date of this Order; and granting 20 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 6/23/11. (kpr)
April 6, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/6/11. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cortez v. Hosto Buchan Prater & Lawrence PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca R Cortez
Represented By: Lorraine Hatcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hosto Buchan Prater & Lawrence PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?