Veasley v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Felicia Veasley
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2010cv00124
Filed: February 19, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2011 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT pursuant to 60 Jury Verdict entered this date, judgment is hereby entered in favor of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company dismissing the complaint of Felecia Veasley with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/9/11. (vjt)
March 4, 2011 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Will Bond, Neil Chamberlin, Sabrina Baker, and David Roe to bring electronic devices into the courthouse in Little Rock between March 7, 2011, and March 9, 2011. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/4/11. (vjt)
March 3, 2011 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 47 Veasley's Motion in Limine, and 48 Allstate's Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/3/11. (vjt)
February 28, 2011 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Jury Trial will begin at 9:15 a.m. on Monday, March 7, 2011; counsel are requested to have 3 copies of their witness and exhibit lists for the Court. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/28/11. (vjt)
January 3, 2011 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pltf's 28 Second Motion to Compel is granted to the extent that Allstate is directed to produce the entire underwriting file to pltf's lawyers on or before 1/18/11, and to file an affidavit that they have done so. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/3/11. (vjt)
December 14, 2010 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot deft's 34 Partial Motion to Quash. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/14/10. (vjt)
December 8, 2010 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 17 Motion to Compel. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/8/10. (vjt)
September 27, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 11 MOTION for Continuance of Jury Trial scheduled for 11/22/10; a new trial date and scheduling deadlines will be set by separate Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/27/10. (vjt)
August 24, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 9 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadlines; Expert Disclosure Deadline is extended to 9/21/10; Discovery due by 10/7/2010; all other deadlines remain in effect. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/24/10. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Veasley v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Veasley
Represented By: Neil R. Chamberlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: John O. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?