Stanton v. Holiday et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Mark Stanton
Defendant: Doc Holiday, Carl Johnson, Strickland and Jackson
Case Number: 4:2010cv00134
Filed: February 25, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2012 74 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Consistent with the order entered today, this case is hereby dismissed without prejudice and the relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/12/12. (hph)
July 7, 2011 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 41 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting the 32 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Carl Johnson. Separate deft Carl Johnson is dismissed from plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/7/11. (kpr)
April 1, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file a response to 32 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Carl Johnson within 10 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/1/11. (vjt)
April 13, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the original and amended complaints and summons on defts without prepayment of costs therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 4/13/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stanton v. Holiday et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Mark Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holiday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?