Exigence LLC v. Littleton et al

Plaintiff: Exigence LLC
Defendant: David A Littleton and Anderson Murphy & Hopkins LLP
Case Number: 4:2010cv00144
Filed: February 26, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: G. Thomas Eisele
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 21, 2013 49 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT dismissing complaint without prejudice on the condition for refiling imposed by the Court's 48 Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/21/13. (kpr)
February 20, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/20/13. (kpr)
August 13, 2012 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion to Quash. The Court directs the parties to meet, confer, and submit an agreed protective order to the Court for entry by 31 August 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 08/13/2012. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exigence LLC v. Littleton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exigence LLC
Represented By: Danny R. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A Littleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson Murphy & Hopkins LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?