Rodriguez v. Pennington et al

Plaintiff: Fredrick Daniel Rodriguez
Defendant: Bruce Pennington, Ray Pennington and Phillip Snodgrass
Case Number: 4:2010cv00147
Filed: March 3, 2010
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2011 86 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 85 Order Adopting Report and Recommendations and dismissing complaint with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/12/11. (kpr)
December 8, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing defts to file a dispositive motion within 30 days of the date of this Order if they intend to rely on the defenses mentioned in their Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 12/8/10. (bkp)
August 3, 2010 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion to Compel without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/2/10. (bkp)
April 23, 2010 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 4/23/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Pennington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fredrick Daniel Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Snodgrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?